judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00341-CR
14-94-00341-CR
04/07/1994
Other Drug Possession
Stennis, Tammy Marie
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/05/1996Case stored
06/26/1996Mandate due to be issued
06/26/1996Mandate Issued
06/26/1996Mandate Issued
06/11/1996Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
04/01/1996Petition for discretionary review due
04/01/1996Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
03/15/1996Motion for rehearing DUE
02/29/1996Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
02/29/1996Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/11/1996Submitted
01/11/1996Submission
01/11/1996Submitted
12/07/1995Submission
07/14/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/14/1994Case ready to be set
07/14/1994Case ready to be set
06/27/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/02/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
06/02/1994Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
05/27/1994Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
05/23/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
05/20/1994Transcript FILED
04/07/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/06/1994Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
03/22/1994Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/18/2017Case StoredCase archived
06/26/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STENNIS, TAMMY MARIECriminal - AppellantJoe F. Cannon
Kristine C. Woldy
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasKimberly Aperauch Stelter
John B. Holmes, Jr.
Trial Court Information
232nd District Court
Harris
614187
15 yrs. TDC & $1000 fine