judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-94-00172-CV
13-94-00172-CV
04/07/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Castaneda, Jose Luis, M.D.P.A.
Fassio, Javier, Javier Garcia and G & F Enterprises, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/19/1999Exhibits Disposed
12/07/1998Mandate Issued
11/06/1998Document Filed
10/01/1998Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
07/23/1998Writ Filed
06/18/1998Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
06/17/1998Filing Fee Paid
06/10/1998Motion for rehearing filed
05/28/1998Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
02/19/1998Submitted
02/19/1998Submission
01/28/1998Filing Fee Paid
01/27/1998Filing Fee Paid
01/22/1998Submission
01/21/1998Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/21/1998Miscellaneous Motion
01/20/1998Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/20/1998Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/20/1998Miscellaneous Motion
01/20/1998Miscellaneous Motion
12/18/1997Letter sent
12/17/1997Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
12/17/1997Submission
10/19/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/17/1995Brief Filed
10/17/1995Appellee's Brief Received
10/17/1995Oral argument requested
10/12/1995Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/04/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/14/1995Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/14/1995Case ready to be set
09/14/1995Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/12/1995Brief Filed
09/12/1995Brief received.
09/12/1995Oral argument requested
09/12/1995Response to _____________.
09/11/1995Motion for Dismissal Filed
09/11/1995Response to _____________.
08/29/1995Miscellaneous Motion
06/27/1994Notice was filed
06/23/1994Order EnteredAbated
06/13/1994Notice of Bankruptcy -- After Disposition
06/13/1994Notice of Bankruptcy -- After Disposition
06/10/1994Exhibits Filed
06/10/1994Statement of Facts Filed
06/10/1994Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
04/25/1994Statement Filed
04/25/1994Filing Fee Paid
04/25/1994Filing Fee Paid
04/21/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
04/07/1994Transcript Filed
04/07/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
04/07/1994Transcript Received
04/07/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/07/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Castaneda, Jose Luis M.D.p.a.AppellantHon. Rene Luna
Hon. Kenneth R. Hannam
Hon. Richard S. Hoffman
Hon. Lisa Nichols
Fassio, Javier Javier GarciaAppelleeJ. Rolando Olvera, Jr.
Tom Fleming
Trial Court Information
138th District Court
Cameron
Honorable Roberto Garza
92-09-5268-B