judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-94-00060-CV
10-94-00060-CV
04/07/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Ace Transportation, Inc.
Timothy Webb
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/26/2002Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
12/17/2001Six yrs. passed final disposition. Record will be destroyed w/in 90 dys unless req. by trial court clerk.
07/25/1994Case stored
07/25/1994Mandate issued by this Court
06/01/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
04/07/1994No Description Available.
04/07/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/26/2002Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ace Transportation, Inc.AppellantM. David Frock
Webb, TimothyAppelleeMichael Thomas
Trial Court Information
87th District Court
Leon
5811-B