judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-94-00137-CR
09-94-00137-CR
04/07/1994
Felony DWI
Gilley, Marvin Edward
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/02/1995MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
10/02/1995Mandate Issued
08/16/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/03/1995Submitted
04/03/1995Submission
03/31/1995Brief Filed
03/31/1995Case ready to be set
03/02/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/01/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/08/1995Brief Filed
11/10/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/03/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/18/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/07/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/08/1994Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
04/07/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
04/07/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/02/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gilley, Marvin EdwardAppellantJames R. Makin
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJudge Troy Johnson
Trial Court Information
260th District Court
Orange
Honorable Buddie J Hahn
D930094-R
2 yrs & $2000 fine probate