judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 06-94-00184-CR
06-94-00184-CR
04/07/1994
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Rice, Tim
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/03/1995Mandate Issued
09/22/1995Case Returned from Higher Ct.
08/23/1995Petition for Discretionary Review FiledWRIT REFUSED
05/11/1995Case Forwarded to Higher Court
04/26/1995Motion for Extension of Time to File PDR DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/20/1995Motion to Extend Time for Filing PDR
04/19/1995Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
04/19/1995Holding for Record
03/16/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/07/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
02/17/1995Opinion issuedReformed/Affirmed
02/07/1995Submitted
02/07/1995Submission
12/28/1994Submission
10/07/1994Request for Oral Argument
10/07/1994Brief Filed
10/07/1994Case ready to be set
09/30/1994Request for Oral Argument
09/30/1994Brief Filed
09/07/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/31/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/08/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/28/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/30/1994Statement of Facts Filed
06/07/1994Transcript Filed
04/07/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/05/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/03/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Rice, TimAppellantHon. John M. Cornelius
Trial Court Information
115th District Court
Marion
Honorable Alvin G. Khoury
11,127
99 Yrs TDCJ-ID