judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DWAYNE EARL POND v. CATHY JO POND

Case Heading (S-08-0253)
Case Number:S-08-0253Case Docketed On:11/25/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:DWAYNE EARL POND v. CATHY JO POND
Full Title:DWAYNE EARL POND, Appellant (Defendant), v. CATHY JO POND, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDwayne Earl PondDwight F. Hurich
AppelleeCathy Jo PondRex O. Arney
Vincent Paul Schutte

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Marriage and Divorce - Property Division
Opinion Number:2009 WY 134
Citation:218 P.3d 650

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/25/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/25/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/25/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/25/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/23/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/24/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/06/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/10/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and copy of brief on diskEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/11/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/24/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/25/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/05/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Exhibits; Volume III, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/05/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/07/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
11/06/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/24/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/24/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/30/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 11/25/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal