judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

FORTINO MESTA v. TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case: B-1341
B-1341
01/22/1969
Application for Writ of Error
FORTINO MESTA
TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/07/1969Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/03/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/11/1969Response to PetitionPetitioner
01/29/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
01/22/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/07/1969Response to Motion filed
04/07/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/03/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/26/1969Opinion issued
02/11/1969Response to Petition
01/29/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/22/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/22/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANYRespondent
Fortino MestaPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information