judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00571-CV
05-94-00571-CV
04/07/1994
Contract
Aviva Petroleum, Inc.
Greyhound Financial Services, Ltd, et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/13/2015Letter issued by the court
06/25/1997Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
07/25/1994Mandate Issued
07/25/1994Mandate Issued
05/19/1994MattConv
05/19/1994Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed
05/19/1994Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed
05/13/1994Transcript Filed
05/02/1994Response to Motion
04/25/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
04/19/1994Exhibits Filed
04/19/1994Statement of Facts Filed
04/07/1994Appeal Bond Filed
04/07/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
01/25/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/25/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
14th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable John M Marshall
92-13814-A