judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-94-00138-CV
09-94-00138-CV
04/07/1994
Other Personal Injury
Allday, Roy
Malone & Hyde, Inc. and Madix, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/06/1996MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
05/06/1996Mandate Issued
05/03/1996Case Returned from Higher Ct.
03/28/1996Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/29/1996Petition for WritMotion or Writ Denied
01/24/1996Petition for Writ
01/08/1996Response
01/05/1996Response
01/04/1996Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
12/21/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
12/07/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/15/1995Submitted
06/15/1995Submission
02/08/1995Submission
09/23/1994Case ready to be set
09/23/1994Brief Filed
09/01/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/29/1994Brief Filed
08/29/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/03/1994Brief Filed
07/18/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/05/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/07/1994Statement of Facts Filed
05/26/1994Motion to Substitute DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/25/1994Motion to Substitute Filed
05/05/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
04/29/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
04/14/1994Motion to Substitute DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/13/1994Motion to Substitute Filed
04/07/1994Transcript Filed
04/07/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/06/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Brown, TeresaCourt reporterTeresa Brown
Madix, Inc.AppelleeBryan T. Calvert
Allday, RoyAppellantMarch H. Coffield
Malone & Hyde, Inc.AppelleeJohn W. Follis, Iii
Argonaut Southwest Ins. Co.IntervenorGregory D. Solcher
Trial Court Information
221st District Court
Montgomery
Honorable Lee G. Alworth
91-06-02165 CV