judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00560-CR
05-94-00560-CR
04/07/1994
Assault or Attempted Murder
Zandstra, Randall John
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/13/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
05/13/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
05/10/1994Transcript Filed
04/29/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
04/29/1994Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Granted
04/21/1994Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
04/21/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
04/07/1994Notice Sent
04/07/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/23/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
02/23/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/13/1994Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Dallas
Honorable Larry W Baraka
F88-78603-JI
4 yrs TDC Probated 4 yrs