judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SANTIBANEZ-GARCIA (JOSE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38252
Short Caption:SANTIBANEZ-GARCIA (JOSE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR98P0605Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/20/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/31/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/31/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-12943
08/13/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 38191/38252. 01-13690
08/20/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 01-14069
08/20/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/30/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-09437
06/25/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-09504
06/25/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/28/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 25, 2002. 02-09504