judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FORREST MYLES BROMLEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0254)
Case Number:S-08-0254Case Docketed On:11/26/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:FORREST MYLES BROMLEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:FORREST MYLES BROMLEY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantForrest Myles BromleyJason M. Tangeman
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Appellate Procedure, Criminal Law, Evidence
Opinion Number:2009 WY 133
Citation:219 P.3d 110

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/26/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/26/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/26/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/05/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/06/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of TimeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/06/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/21/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/23/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/05/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Third Motion for Extension of TimeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/10/2009Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
02/19/2009Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other - Received copy of order correcting record and motion to extend deadline from the District Court Clerk.Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
02/19/2009Notice-Outgoing - Other. Sent e-mail to Mr. Tangeman informing him that if he needed any further extensions of time, he had to request one himself and reference Judge Waldrip's order correcting record.Notice-OutgoingOtherFinal
02/20/2009Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
03/03/2009Brief - Failure to file - appellantBriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
03/03/2009Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
03/03/2009Petition - ReinstatementPetitionReinstatementFinal
03/04/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Petition and Brief to Reinstate Case in Appellate CourtEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/05/2009Event - Phone Call - received call from Mike Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General, indicating that they will not file a response to the motion for reinstatement.EventPhone CallFinal
03/10/2009Order - ReinstatementOrderReinstatementFinal
03/13/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/13/2009Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant; and copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/13/2009Event - Phone Call - contacted counsel for appellant and requested original plus six copies of certificate of service electronically filed with brief of appellant this date.EventPhone CallFinal
04/24/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/27/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/11/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/12/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/12/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jason Tangeman for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/15/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/20/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
05/20/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, twelve volumes. Volumes I-VII, Original Papers; Volumes VIII-X, Transcripts; Volume XI, Confidential Folder; Volume XII, CD from Circuit Court.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/20/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/16/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Jason Tangeman for appellant; Graham Smith, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/16/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/04/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/20/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/20/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/20/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/20/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/24/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card (2)ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal