judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TYRONE A. JACKSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1433
Short Caption:TYRONE A. JACKSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-4786-10Filed Date:11/16/2010

Opening Event Date:11/16/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/29/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:08/24/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/27/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/05/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTyrone A. Jackson Y
Ian A. WilliamsYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Amanda J. Winchester YN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/16/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Ian A. Williams, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
12/03/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Ian A. Williams, Esquire
01/03/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
03/29/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (98 pgs/Ramos) 8/13/10 proc. w/cd
03/29/2011RECORD COPIES
03/29/2011RECORD INDEX
03/29/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (SEALED DOCUMENT)
03/29/2011RECORD COMPLETED
04/05/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
05/20/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (unopposed)
05/20/2011RECEIVED - Appellant's Brief with Appendix attached
06/07/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for leave to late file the lodged brief and limited appendix, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of the order. (Castillo)
06/07/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF w/attached limited appendix
06/24/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 7/25/11
07/12/2011FiledOn consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before July 25, 2011. (JJ)
07/25/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
07/28/2011FiledOrder Granting appellee's motion for extension to 8/24/11.
08/24/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/24/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/18/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/06/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
12/28/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellant)
01/30/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/27/2012FiledArgued Before Blackburne-Rigsby,Beckwith,Belson Ian A.Williams Esq.,for appellant Amanda J.Winchester Esq for appellee
03/29/2012FiledSupplemental Record - #3 (Defendent's exhibit 1 photo in brown envelope filed 8/13/10)
12/13/2012FiledReversed And Remanded (OPINION) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and Belson)
12/27/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellee)Denied
01/11/2013FiledOrdered that appellant, within 14 days from the date of this order, shall file a response (ten copies) thereto.
01/25/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Opposition/Reply/Answer to petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc (Appellant)
02/04/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File opposition
02/15/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motions and the Clerk shall file appellant's lodged response to appellee's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
02/15/2013FiledOpposition to appellant's petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc (Appellant)
10/24/2013FiledOrder Denying appellee's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
11/05/2013FiledMandate