judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-1342
B-1342
01/22/1969
Application for Writ of Error
E. D. GILLIS
ETTA T. GILLIS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/01/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/22/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/01/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/31/1969Motion to amend application for writ of error
02/04/1969Response to Motion filed
01/27/1969Motion to dismiss
01/22/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/22/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
E. D. GillisPetitioner
Etta T. GillisRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information