judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-94-00097-CR
12-94-00097-CR
04/07/1994
Arson
Johnson, James H.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/12/1994Disposition of MotionMotion or Writ No Action Taken
04/12/1994Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
04/12/1994Order EnteredConsolidated & Void
04/12/1994Case ready to be set
04/12/1994Submission
04/12/1994Submitted
04/07/1994No Description Available.
04/07/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/28/1994Motion For New Trial filed in trial court
02/28/1989
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/12/1994Case StoredCase stored
04/13/2020RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasMr. Don Gordon
Johnson, James H.Criminal - AppellantJames H. Johnson
Trial Court Information
349th District Court
Honorable Melvin D. Whitaker
13,017CR
15 yrs TDC