judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00092-CV
07-94-00092-CV
04/08/1994
Other Personal Injury
Gilstrap, Nicole, et al
Park Lane Town Home Association, et al
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/18/1994Mandate Issued
10/03/1994Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
09/26/1994Submitted
09/26/1994Submission
09/12/1994Submission
04/29/1994Brief Filed
04/29/1994Case ready to be set
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/07/1994Brief Filed
03/07/1994Do not use
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/18/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gilstrap, Nicole NicoleAppellantJim S. Adler
Park Lane Town Home AssociatioAppelleeJ. Robert Miller Jr.
Julie H. Brown
Nicole, GilstrapAppellantGregg O. Oberg
Trial Court Information
95th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Joe B. Brown
92-2598-D