judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00101-CV
07-94-00101-CV
04/08/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Highland Partners, Ltd.
Moran, Roy B.
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/30/2005Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
12/28/1994Mandate Issued
11/07/1994Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/28/1994Response to any order, inquiry or motion
10/21/1994Motion for Rehearing Filed
10/13/1994Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
09/30/1994Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/22/1994Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
09/22/1994Submitted
09/22/1994Submission
06/21/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
06/15/1994Supplemental Brief Filed
06/10/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/03/1994Case ready to be set
06/03/1994Brief Filed
05/06/1994Brief Filed
04/28/1994Do not use
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
03/10/1994Mediation Information Sheet
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Moran, Roy B.AppelleeMichael Dover
William L Wolf
Highland Partners, Ltd.AppellantRichard L Jackson
Trial Court Information
68th District Court
Dallas
Honorable David Cave
93-10599-C