judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00208-CR
04-94-00208-CR
04/08/1994
Marijuana Sale or ManUfacture
Mifflin, Daniel K.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/24/1994Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
10/24/1994Mandate received by the trial court
10/20/1994Mandate Issued
10/20/1994Mandate Issued
08/31/1994Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/31/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
08/31/1994Opinion issuedDismissed
07/21/1994Motion to Withdraw Appeal Filed
04/21/1994Motion for New Trial Filed
04/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/06/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/23/1994Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/20/1994Case StoredCase stored
10/20/2019RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mifflin, Daniel K.Criminal - AppellantDan Griffin
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasE. Bruce Curry
Trial Court Information
216th Judicial District Court
Bandera
Honorable Stephen B. Ables
2736-93
8YRS TDC,SHOCK PRON.BOOT C