judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00096-CV
07-94-00096-CV
04/08/1994
Contract
Greene, Bobby
Midwest Financial Group, Inc., d/b/a The Light Source
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/19/1995Mandate Issued
03/28/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/02/1995Submitted
03/02/1995Submission
02/03/1995Submission
05/27/1994Brief Filed
05/27/1994Case ready to be set
05/02/1994Brief Filed
04/25/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
04/21/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/14/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
03/09/1994Do not use
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/19/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Greene, BobbyAppellantLarry Boyd
Midwest Financial Group, Inc.,AppelleeDarrell D. Minter
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No 2
Dallas
Honorable Samuel C. Kiser
CC92-1232-B