judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00089-CR
07-94-00089-CR
04/08/1994
Marijuana Possession
Ibarra, Felix C.
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/28/1996Mandate Issued
02/12/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/30/1995Submitted
11/30/1995Submission
10/18/1995Submission
08/07/1995Brief Filed
08/07/1995Case ready to be set
07/27/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
06/26/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
04/25/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
04/24/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
03/29/1995Brief Filed
03/27/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
12/27/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
12/23/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/21/1994Do not use
11/21/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of FactsGRANT
11/08/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
11/07/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
08/23/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of FactsGRANT
08/22/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
08/11/1994Letter of Inquiry filed
06/16/1994Mot - Ext. to File TranscriptGRANT
05/10/1994Do not use
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
03/25/1994Do not use
03/25/1994Letter of Inquiry filed
02/18/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/28/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ibarra, Felix C.Criminal - AppellantGary A. Udashen
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJohn C. Vance
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court
Dallas
Honorable Janice Lough Warder
F93-02948-PH
15 yrs, TDC