judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00088-CR
07-94-00088-CR
04/08/1994
Sexual Abuse or Rape of Child
Gonzales, Steven
The State of Texas
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/19/1996Mandate Issued
03/26/1996Case Returned from Higher Court
01/10/1996Case Forwarded to Higher Court
01/08/1996Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
12/04/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/30/1995Submitted
11/30/1995Submission
10/18/1995Submission
08/29/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
08/28/1995Brief Filed
08/28/1995Case ready to be set
08/28/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/04/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
06/08/1995Response to any order, inquiry or motion
06/05/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
03/31/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
03/31/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
03/06/1995Brief Filed
01/31/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
01/30/1995Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/20/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
12/19/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/28/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
11/23/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/21/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
10/20/1994Do not use
10/20/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
09/22/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of FactsGRANT
08/29/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of FactsGRANT
06/24/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of FactsGRANT
06/20/1994Do not use
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
03/04/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/19/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJohn C. Vance
Gonzales, StevenCriminal - AppellantKerry P. Fitzgerald
Trial Court Information
265th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Keith T. Dean
F93-04607-TR