judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

EDWARD A. FITCH v. HOMER Y. JONES, ET AL.

Case: B-1336
B-1336
01/22/1969
Application for Writ of Error
EDWARD A. FITCH
HOMER Y. JONES, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/05/1969Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/05/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
01/22/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/05/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/21/1969Opinion issued
02/26/1969Document received (See Remarks)
02/26/1969Document received (See Remarks)
02/26/1969Document received (See Remarks)
02/05/1969Response to Petition
01/22/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/22/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Edward A. FitchPetitioner
Homer Y. Jones, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information