judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM A. WILSON, III V. FRANCESCA CRAIG

Case Information: 10-FM-1429
Short Caption:WILLIAM A. WILSON, III V. FRANCESCA CRAIGClassification:Appeals - Family - Support
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB421-02Filed Date:11/10/2010

Opening Event Date:11/10/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/31/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:04/14/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/13/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/12/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam A. Wilson, IIINPro SeN
AppelleeFrancesca CraigNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/10/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/02/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on November 10, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
12/15/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 7/14/05 7/29/05 8/1/05 9/15/05 10/17/05 (rt. needed)
01/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (183 pgs/Janifer - 7/14/05 proc.)(Transferred from 06-FM-1553)
01/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (247 pgs/Shelton - 7/29/05 proc.)(Transferred from 06-FM-1553)
01/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (54 pgs/Coney - 8/1/05 proc.)(Transferred from 06-FM-1553)
01/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (25 pgs/Pirfo - 9/15/05 proc.)(Transferred from 06-FM-1553)
01/31/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (142 pgs/Pirfo - 10/17/05 proc.)(Transferred from 06-FM-1553)
01/31/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/04/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
02/25/2011RECORD INDEX
03/15/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/15/2011APPENDIX (attached to brief)
04/14/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
04/14/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/20/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
05/04/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/13/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Fisher, Thompson, Farrell
08/16/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
08/30/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
09/14/2012FiledMotion for publication (Appellant)Denied
09/26/2012FiledOpposition to appellant's Motion to Publish (Appellee)
10/04/2012FiledOrder Denying aplt's motion to publish MOJ.
11/01/2012FiledChange Of Address Received From (Appellant)
12/04/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for rehearing en banc is denied.
12/12/2012FiledMandate