judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LARRY DEAN SUTTON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0249)
Case Number:S-08-0249Case Docketed On:11/20/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:LARRY DEAN SUTTON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:LARRY DEAN SUTTON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLarry Dean Sutton Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law
Opinion Number:2009 WY 60
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/20/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/20/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
11/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/07/2009Brief - AndersBriefAndersFinal
01/07/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/07/2009Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of recordFinal
01/07/2009Record - Received unfiled recordRecordReceived unfiled recordFinal
01/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Other - Requested Trial Exhibit #55Notice-OutgoingOtherFinal
01/16/2009Record - Received unfiled record, Exhibit 55.RecordReceived unfiled recordFinal
01/27/2009Order - Deny - Anders brief and denying permission for counsel to withdraw. Called Public Defender's Office to pick-up recordOrderDeny - Anders briefFinal
01/27/2009Record - Returned unfiled record - Trial Exhibit 55RecordReturned unfiled recordFinal
01/30/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Exhibit 55 signed for 1/29/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
02/26/2009Record - Received unfiled recordRecordReceived unfiled recordFinal
02/26/2009Brief - AndersBriefAndersFinal
02/26/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/26/2009Motion - Other - motion to withdraw as counsel.MotionOtherFinal
02/26/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Amended brief of appellant pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/26/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time of file pro se briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/26/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdraw as counselEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/10/2009Order - Allowing court appointed counsel to withdraw, conditionally affirming judgment and sentence and setting briefing schedule for appellantOrderAllowing court appointed counsel to withdrawFinal
04/28/2009Brief - Failure to file - appellant's Anders BriefBriefFailure to file - appellantFinal
05/01/2009Opinion - Published order Affirming the Judgment and Sentence of the District CourtOpinionPublished orderFinal
05/19/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/19/2009Record - Returned unfiled recordRecordReturned unfiled recordFinal
05/19/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/19/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/21/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 5/20/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal