judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CORRAL (JAMES) VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 38247
Short Caption:CORRAL (JAMES) VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C168581Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Certiorari/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/30/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/30/2001Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. 01-12806
08/01/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Affidavit of party beneficially interested. Due Date: 10 days
08/06/2001MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. 01-13216
08/07/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. " . . . we deny the petition." fn1[We deny petitioner's motion filed in this court on August 6, 2001.] SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-13317
08/08/2001Petition/WritFiled Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ. 01-13362
08/16/2001Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Motion for Rehearing and Published Opinion. 01-13929
08/22/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file an answer to the petition for rehearing. 01-14200
09/10/2001Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for Rehearing. 01-15204
09/18/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Answer to Petition for Rehearing. 01-15742
09/26/2001MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion to File Reply Brief to Supplemental Answer to Petition for Rehearing. 01-16208
02/07/2002MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Motion for Stay of Proceeding in the District Court. 02-02474
02/07/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[We grant the State's motion for permission to file a supplemental answer and petitioner's motion for permission to file a reply. The clerk of this court shall file the supplemental answer and the reply received in this court on September 19, 2001, and September 26, 2001, respectively. We have considered these documents in resolving the petition for rehearing.] SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 02-02514
02/07/2002Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Supplement to Petition for Rehearing. Supplemental Answer to Petition for Rehearing. 01-15743
02/07/2002MotionFiled Reply to Response. Reply to Supplemental Answer to Petition for Rehearing. 01-16209
03/11/2002RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 02-04348
03/11/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/13/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On February 7, 2002, this court entered an order denying a pending petition for rehearing in this matter. On that same date, petitioner filed a motion for a stay of the proceedings in the district court pending this court's resolution of the petition for rehearing. In light of our order denying rehearing, we deny as moot the motion for a stay. 02-04506