judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00576-CR
05-94-00576-CR
04/08/1994
Robbery
Edwards, Omar A.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/13/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
05/13/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
04/25/1994Statement of Facts Filed
04/08/1994Notice Sent
04/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/07/1994Transcript Filed
03/25/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
02/24/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/13/1994Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1
Dallas
Honorable Janice L. Warder
F91-00062-TH
Life, TDC * $10,000 Fine