judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-94-00219-CV
04-94-00219-CV
04/08/1994
Summary Judgment
Curry, Jerome P.
Tackett, John; Pearson, Michael; Cardwell, Cary; Irish, George; Rademaekers, Edward; & Hearst Corporation D/B/A San Antonio Light
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/17/1994Mandate Issued
11/17/1994Mandate Issued
09/21/1994Motion for Dismissal DisposedFiling is Moot
09/21/1994Motion for Dismissal DisposedFiling is Moot
09/21/1994Opinion issuedDismissed for Want of Prosecution
09/21/1994Opinion issuedDismissed for Want of Prosecution
08/01/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
07/12/1994Information regarding cause received
07/12/1994Information regarding cause received
07/12/1994Information regarding cause received
06/20/1994Show cause hearing held
06/20/1994Show cause hearing held
06/20/1994Show cause hearing held
06/20/1994Show cause hearing held
06/10/1994Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
04/08/1994No Description Available.
04/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/02/1994Affidavit of Inability Filed
03/02/1994Affidavit of Inability Filed
02/08/1994Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/17/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jerome P. CurryAppellantJerome P. Curry
John Tackett, Et Al.AppelleeJudith R. Blakeway
Trial Court Information
285th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Carlos Cadena
92-CI-17025
N/A