judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00103-CV
07-94-00103-CV
04/08/1994
Miscellaneous civil
The State of Texas
One Thousand Three Hundred Forty Three Dollars in US Currency
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/30/2005Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
05/17/1996Mandate Issued
04/01/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/30/1995Submitted
11/30/1995Submission
10/18/1995Submission
05/02/1994Brief Filed
05/02/1994Case ready to be set
04/11/1994Brief Filed
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
03/11/1994Do not use
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/17/1996Case StoredCase stored
09/30/2005Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
One Thousand Three Hundred ForAppelleeCharles E. Carruth
The State Of TexasAppellantMr. Herbert Garon
Trial Court Information
14th District Court
Dallas
Honorable John M. Marshall
93-00185-A