judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00102-CV
07-94-00102-CV
04/08/1994
Other Personal Injury
City of Dallas, Texas
Ormsby, Helen, et al
No
5th Court of Appeals
04/08/1994
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/30/2005Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
12/29/1995Mandate Issued
12/08/1995Case Returned from Higher Court
07/27/1995Case Forwarded to Higher Court
07/26/1995Writ of Habeas Corpus, Prohibition, Etc.
06/23/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/15/1995Response to any order, inquiry or motion
06/06/1995Mot. for extension of time to file Rehearing DispGRANT
06/02/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/02/1995Do not use
05/24/1995Mot. for extension of time to file rehearing filed
04/28/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/02/1995Submitted
03/02/1995Submission
02/03/1995Submission
07/11/1994Brief Filed
07/11/1994Case ready to be set
06/16/1994Supplemental Record Filed
06/16/1994Motion to Supplement the Record FiledGRANT
06/10/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
05/19/1994Brief Filed
04/21/1994Do not use
04/19/1994Do not use
04/18/1994Do not use
04/15/1994Do not use
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
04/08/1994Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
03/11/1994Mediation Information Sheet
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/30/2005Case StoredCase destroyed
12/29/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City Of Dallas, TexasAppellantJohn E. Kirby
Ormsby, Helen HelenAppelleeJohn R. Wright
Trial Court Information
44th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Candace G. Tyson
88-14496-B