judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00124-CR
02-94-00124-CR
04/08/1994
Robbery
Zarate, Severo Antonio
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/25/1996Mandate Issued
02/28/1996Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
01/02/1996Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
12/14/1995Mo for Ext to File Petition for Discretionary ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
11/16/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
11/03/1995Response Filed
10/27/1995Motion for Extension for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/27/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
10/25/1995Motion for Extension for Rehearing Filed
10/11/1995Motion for Extension for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/05/1995Motion for Extension for Rehearing Filed
09/21/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/09/1995Motion for Extension to File Supp. Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/09/1995Supplemental Brief Filed
05/04/1995Motion for Extension to File Supp. Brief Filed
05/02/1995Submitted
05/02/1995Submission
03/02/1995Brief Filed
03/02/1995Case ready to be set
01/03/1995Motion to Substitute Attorney DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/30/1994Motion to Substitute Attorney Filed
12/05/1994Brief Filed
11/08/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/07/1994Letter
11/07/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
10/27/1994Notice to Attorneys of no Brief Filed
10/07/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/06/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
05/03/1994No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
05/03/1994No Description Available.
05/03/1994No Description Available.
05/02/1994No Description Available.
05/02/1994Submission
04/08/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
04/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/25/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Zarate, Severo AntonioCriminal - AppellantAllan K. Butcher
David Chapman
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasBetty Marshall
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 4
Tarrant
Honorable Joseph Drago, III
0409697D
25 YRS IDTDCJ $1250. FINE