judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00123-CR
02-94-00123-CR
04/08/1994
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Hall, Ronnie Dee
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/1996Mandate Issued
05/01/1996Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCARefused
03/04/1996Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
02/01/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/05/1995Letter Brief Filed
05/03/1995Submitted
05/03/1995Submission
03/06/1995Brief Filed
03/06/1995Case ready to be set
12/19/1994Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/28/1994Motion Filed
10/14/1994Brief Filed
09/29/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/27/1994Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
05/03/1994Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
05/03/1994Submission
04/08/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
04/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/06/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasBetty Marshall
Hall, Ronnie DeeCriminal - AppellantJack V. Strickland
Michael Logan Ware
Trial Court Information
372nd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Ira Sam Houston
0536621AR
LIFE IDTDCJ & $10,000 FINE