judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 06-94-00072-CV
06-94-00072-CV
04/08/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Holt, Earl and Wife, Earlene Boss Holt
Ray, Rex and Wife, Belle D. Ray
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/28/2002Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
07/22/1994Mandate Issued
06/01/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/24/1994Submitted
05/24/1994Submission
05/20/1994Brief Filed
05/20/1994Case ready to be set
04/28/1994Brief Filed
04/15/1994Statement of Facts Filed
04/08/1994Transcript Filed
04/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/22/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Holt, Earl And EarleneAppellantHon. Thomas L. Hooton
Ray, Rex And Belle D.AppelleeHon. Richard M. Barron
Trial Court Information
336th District Court
Fannin
Honorable Ray Felty Grisham
28928