judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID MALLOF, ET AL V. DC ALCOHOL BEV. CONT. BD.

Case Information: 10-AA-1427
Short Caption:DAVID MALLOF, ET AL V. DC ALCOHOL BEV. CONT. BD.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Alcohol Beverage Control Board (ABC)
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:PRO00094-10Filed Date:11/18/2010

Opening Event Date:11/18/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/06/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/31/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/04/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/08/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerAlexis Rieffel N
Michael K. Hibey YN
PetitionerDavid Mallof N
Michael K. Hibey YN
RespondentD.C. Alcoholic Beverage Control BoardN
Todd S. KimNY
John L. Davie YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/18/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
11/18/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
11/19/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Todd Kim, Esq.
01/06/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/ hearing of 10/13/10
01/06/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/07/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
02/11/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
02/11/2011APPENDIX
03/18/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 3/25/11
03/25/2011RECEIVED- respondent's brief
03/31/2011ORDER GRANT RESP MOTION TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF and the lodged brief is filed. It is F/O that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division as soon as the calendar permits. (JAC)
03/31/2011RESPONDENT'S BRIEF
03/31/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/08/2011FiledFinal Screening - Regular
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
07/01/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING petitioner
07/25/2011FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Respondent)
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/04/2011FiledArgued Before Fisher,Blackburne-Rigsby,Schwelb Michael K.Hibey Esq.,for Petitioner Richard S. Love Esq.,for Respondent
05/17/2012FiledVacated In Part/Remanded In Part (OPINION) (Fisher and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.)
05/31/2012FiledMotion For Costs And/Or Attorney Fees (Petitioner's)
06/01/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR COSTS
06/08/2012FiledMandate
06/29/2012FiledOrder Granting petitioners' motion for costs to the extent that petitoners are award costs in the amount of $ 576.36 (FIBRSC)