Case Heading (S-08-0248) | |||||
Case Number: | S-08-0248 | Case Docketed On: | 11/19/2008 | ||
Linked To: | S-08-0247 | ||||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | First Judicial District Laramie County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20) | ||
Short Title: | ROBERT PAUL PARRIS v. JAMIE SUE PARRIS | ||||
Full Title: | ROBERT PAUL PARRIS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. JAMIE SUE PARRIS, Appellee (Defendant). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Robert Paul Parris | Daniel E. White |
Appellee | Jamie Sue Parris | Mary T. Parsons |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Child Custody/Visitation |
Opinion Number: | 2009 WY 44 |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
11/19/2008 | Event - Docketed and indexed (Clarified Judgment and Decree) | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
11/19/2008 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court (Letter dated November 14, postmarked November 18) | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
11/19/2008 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
11/19/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
11/21/2008 | Motion - Stay - other Stay of Execution | Motion | Stay - other | Final | |
11/21/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received Motion for Stay of Execution Pending Appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
11/21/2008 | Motion - Stay - other | Motion | Stay - other | Final | |
11/21/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received Motion to Stay Execution Pending Appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/03/2008 | Motion - Stay briefing - opposed | Motion | Stay briefing - opposed | Final | |
12/03/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's motion for stay of briefing schedule; and received proposed order. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/09/2008 | Order - Denying Motion for Stay of Execution Pending Appeal | Order | Deny | Final | |
12/30/2008 | Order - Denying Motion for Stay of Briefing Schedule | Order | Deny | Final | |
01/06/2009 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
01/06/2009 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
02/17/2009 | Event - Phone Call - Spoke with Diane at District Court. There was a hearing on this case on February 12, 2009 - but no order yet. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
02/20/2009 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
02/20/2009 | Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
02/25/2009 | Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
03/09/2009 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
03/09/2009 | Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of appellant | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
03/10/2009 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
03/11/2009 | Order - Assigning to expedited docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
03/23/2009 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, six volumes. Volumes I-V, Original Papers; Volume VI, Transcripts. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
03/23/2009 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
03/30/2009 | Event - Expedited Assignment | Event | Brief Only Assignment | Final | |
03/30/2009 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the Court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
04/15/2009 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
04/15/2009 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
04/15/2009 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
04/15/2009 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
04/20/2009 | Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 4/15/09. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |