judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 06-94-00075-CV
06-94-00075-CV
04/08/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Gilbert, Alvis
Jennings, Barbara Jean
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/28/2002Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
07/13/1995Mandate Issued
06/21/1995Case Returned from Higher Ct.
06/15/1995Motion for Rehearing Disposed
05/04/1995Writ Disposed
02/09/1995Case Forwarded to Higher Court
01/27/1995Writ Filed
12/28/1994Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
12/06/1994Motion to File DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/02/1994Motion for Rehearing Filed
12/02/1994Motion for leave to file
12/02/1994Holding for Record
11/04/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/10/1994Brief Filed
06/10/1994Case ready to be set
06/10/1994Submitted
06/10/1994Submission
05/31/1994Motion to File DispMotion or Writ Granted
05/20/1994Motion for leave to file
05/17/1994Motion for Dismissal DisposedOverruled
05/16/1994Brief Filed
05/16/1994Holding for Record
05/16/1994Response to Motion
05/13/1994Motion to Dismiss Appeal
04/14/1994No Description Available.
04/08/1994Transcript Filed
04/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/13/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jennings, Barbara JeanAppelleeHon. Danny Woodson
Gilbert, AlvisAppellantHon. Robert W. Buchholz
Trial Court Information
8th District Court
Franklin
7925