judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00179-CV
03-94-00179-CV
04/08/1994
Declaratory judgment
John B. Holmes, Jr., Harris County District Attorney
Dan Morales, Attorney General of the State of Texas; Randy Schaffer; Winfred H. Morgan; David Branam; Mark Moore; Bridget Chapman; Joe Gorton; Harold Lloyd; Lee Willie Maxie; and Shirley Southerland
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/23/2004Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/01/1997CASE STORED
07/26/1996Mandate Issued
06/14/1996Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
03/07/1996Application Writ Sup Ct Granted
12/04/1995Case forwarded to higher court
11/27/1995Petition for writ of mandamus
10/25/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/05/1995Response to Motion
09/14/1995Motion for extension to file reply disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/11/1995Motion for extension to file reply filed
08/31/1995Motion for rehearing filed
08/16/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/26/1995Brief received, not filed
03/30/1995Post-submission brief filed
02/15/1995Submitted
02/15/1995Submission
02/14/1995Oral argument acknowledged
01/19/1995Oral argument acknowledged
01/09/1995Oral argument acknowledged
12/29/1994Submission
08/01/1994Brief filed
08/01/1994Case ready to be set
06/28/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/22/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/10/1994Supplemental Transcript filed
06/06/1994Brief filed
05/09/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/05/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/22/1994Supplemental Transcript filed
04/13/1994Response requested (postcard)
04/08/1994Transcript Filed
04/08/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/26/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Morgan, Winfred H.AppelleeMr. Winfred H. Morgan
Morales, Dan Attorney GeneralAppelleeMs. Diane Weidert Morris
The Honorable Dan Morales
Branam, DavidAppelleeMr. David Branam
Maxey, Lee WillieAppelleeMr. Lee Willie Maxey
Schaffer, RandyAppelleeMr. Randy Schaffer
Lloyd, HaroldAppelleeMr. Harold Lloyd
Holmes, Jr., John B., Harris CAppellantMr. William J. Delmore, Iii
Gorton, JoeAppelleeMr. Joe Gorton
Moore, MarkAppelleeMr. Mark Moore
Chapman, BridgetAppelleeMs. Bridget Chapman
Southerland, ShirleyAppelleeMs. Shirley Southerland
Trial Court Information
261st District Court
Travis
Honorable John K. Dietz
93-07978