Case Information: 38266 | |||
Short Caption: | NASH FINANCIAL VS. SECRETARY OF STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A433974 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 08/16/2001 / Aurbach, Phillip | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/03/2001 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Manos & Michaelides--check no. 22376. | ||
08/03/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 01-13139 | |
08/16/2001 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Phillip Aurbach. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
09/11/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. To date appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 01-15291 | |
09/26/2001 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation to Dismiss Appeal and District Court Order. | 01-16243 | |
10/24/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK | 01-17914 | |
10/24/2001 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |