judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00826-CR
01-89-00826-CR
08/11/1989
Other Drug Possession
Watts, Nathaniel
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/27/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/27/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/07/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
06/22/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
06/07/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/07/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/15/1990Submitted
05/15/1990Submission
05/15/1990Submitted
03/28/1990Submission
02/01/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
02/01/1990Case ready to be set
02/01/1990Case ready to be set
01/11/1990Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
01/11/1990Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/28/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
12/21/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/18/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
12/07/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/16/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
11/06/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/09/1989Statement of facts filed
10/05/1989Transcript filed
08/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/09/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
08/09/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/27/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of TexasMargaret Stewart
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - AppellantKent Hargis
StateCriminal - State of TexasHon. Mary Lou Keel
Trial Court Information
179th District Court
Harris
530,148
7 yrs tdc