judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00828-CR
01-89-00828-CR
08/11/1989
Other Drug Possession
Collinsworth, Gary Wayne
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/19/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
07/19/1990Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/30/1990No petition for review or writ of error was filed
06/15/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
05/31/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/31/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/15/1990Submitted
05/15/1990Submission
05/15/1990Submitted
04/02/1990Submission
12/21/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
12/21/1989Case ready to be set
12/21/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
12/21/1989Waiver
12/21/1989Case ready to be set
12/06/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
11/16/1989Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
11/06/1989Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
10/09/1989Statement of facts filed
10/09/1989Transcript filed
08/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/09/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
08/09/1989Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/19/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - AppellantJames M. Leitner
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
Trial Court Information
262nd District Court
Harris
530,285
20 yrs tdc