judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BEVERLY (LLOYD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38267
Short Caption:BEVERLY (LLOYD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35526 , 42090 , 44629 , 45547 , 46547 , 47002 , 48462 , 50029 , 55482
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C156922Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/26/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/03/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/03/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-13144
08/06/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment filed 7/5/01. Due Date: 10 days
08/13/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: July 5, 2001. 01-13736
08/13/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: July 5, 2001. 01-13737
08/22/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 6/25/01. Court Reporter: Dick Kangas. Filed in district court on: August 20, 2001. 01-14263
08/24/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 25, 2001. Court Reporter: Richard L. Kangas. 01-14373
09/20/2001MotionFiled Motion. 01-15912
09/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Upon the initial review of this appeal, it appeared that appellant was represented by the Clark County Public Defender. On September 20, 2001, the Clark County Public Defender filed a motion to withdraw as attorney of record in this appeal. The public defender points out that appellant actually appeared in proper person in the district court. This appeal is therefore not subject to NRAP 3C. The motion is granted and the Clark County Public Defender is relieved of any further obligation in regard to this appeal. 01-16296
10/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 38065/38267/38293/38311/38333/38359. 01-17800
12/26/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. 01-21725
12/26/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/18/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Supplemental record (certified copy of the transcript of the proceedings in district court on September 16, 1999) due: 30 days. 02-10585
07/16/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: September 16, 1999. Court Reporter: Richard L. Kangas. 02-12195
07/26/2002Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 3. 02-12895
08/21/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-14336
09/17/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-14832
09/17/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/27/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 19, 2002. 02-14832