judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KARA DUNHAM v. ROBERT FULLERTON, Deceased

Case Heading (S-10-0242)
Case Number:S-10-0242Case Docketed On:11/10/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:KARA DUNHAM v. ROBERT FULLERTON, Deceased
Full Title:KARA DUNHAM, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. ROBERT FULLERTON, Deceased, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKara DunhamTodd H. Hambrick
AppelleeRobert FullertonJames Dale Bramer

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Contracts
Opinion Number:2011 WY 103
Citation:258 P.3d 701

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/10/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/10/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/10/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/23/2010Motion - Stay - otherMotionStay - otherFinal
11/24/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's motion for stay of proceedings in lower courts.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/13/2010Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
12/13/2010Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant requesting six copies of responseEventPhone CallFinal
12/14/2010Order - Denying Motion for StayOrderDenyFinal
12/15/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/20/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Appellant's Response to Motion for StayEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/20/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/24/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/25/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/04/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/08/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/10/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/10/2011Event - Phone Call - to Counsel for Appellant requesting original signature, will sendEventPhone CallFinal
02/10/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/10/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, one volume, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Received signed copy of signature pages for original brief.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
02/15/2011Motion - Oral argument - reassignment from expedited docketMotionOral argument - reassignment from brief only docketFinal
02/16/2011Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
02/17/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Assignment to Oral Argument and Appellant's Objections and Response to Motion for Assignment to Oral ArgumentEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/01/2011Order - Denying Motion for Assignment to Oral Argument DocketOrderDenyFinal
07/06/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/22/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/22/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/22/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/28/2011Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal