judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SILVANO MATAL LOPEZ V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1450
Short Caption:SILVANO MATAL LOPEZ V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM916-10Filed Date:10/02/2010

Opening Event Date:10/02/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/10/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/22/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSilvano Matal Lopez Y
John L. MachadoYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Adam B. Schwartz NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/02/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/04/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) John Machado, Esquire
12/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that John Machado, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal nunc pro tunc to October 4, 2010. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
12/20/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
02/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (72 pgs/Shelton - 8/26/10 proc.)(hardcopy returned to CRRD for a reprint - several pages have a printing fade and are unreadible)(reprinted from CD)
02/10/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (pgs 73 thru 119/Shelton - 8/27/10 proc.)(w/CD)
02/10/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/16/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (72pgs/Shelton) 8/26/10 proc.
02/22/2011RECORD INDEX
02/22/2011RECORD COPIES
02/24/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
04/18/2011 On consideration of this court's order of February 24, 2011, directing counsel for appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (By: JAC)
05/26/2011 On consideration of this court's order of April 18, 2011, which directed appellant to submit the brief and the limited appendix within 20 days, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that the brief and limited appendix have not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the brief and the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either tot imely file the documents or to request an extension of time w/n which to do so. (ETW)
06/17/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (no oppo)
06/17/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief
06/17/2011RECEIVED - aplt's appendix
07/06/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to late file the lodged brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee_ shall be filed with this court within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
07/06/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF/appendix
08/04/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)
08/08/2011FiledTMC-MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
10/27/2011FiledAffirmed (OPINION) Blackburne-Rigsby and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Newman, Senior Judge.
11/22/2011FiledMandate