judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00187-CV
02-89-00187-CV
08/11/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Siddons, Steven B. & Randy B. Pritchett
Smith, H. C. & NCNB Texas National Bank
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/13/1990Mandate Issued
06/27/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/14/1990Submitted
03/14/1990Submission
02/26/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/26/1990Motion Filed
12/20/1989Brief Filed
12/18/1989Supplemental Brief Filed
11/28/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/27/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
10/31/1989Brief Filed
10/02/1989Submission
10/02/1989No Description Available.
09/26/1989Motion for Extension to file Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/25/1989Motion for Extension to File Transcript Filed
08/11/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/13/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
355th District Court
Hood
Honorable Ralph H. Walton,
89019-C