judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00190-CV
02-89-00190-CV
08/11/1989
Miscellaneous civil
In the Matter of E. M. S. (Sotello)
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/18/1989Mandate Issued
11/02/1989Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/28/1989Submitted
09/28/1989Submission
09/21/1989Brief Filed
09/08/1989Brief Filed
09/08/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/07/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
08/15/1989Submission
08/15/1989No Description Available.
08/11/1989No Description Available.
08/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/18/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Probate Court No. 1
Tarrant
19559