judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1049-89
PD-1049-89
07/17/1989
PDR Case Type
CARREON, ALEJANDRO DE JESUS, PRIN. &
ARMADILLO BAIL BONDS, SURETY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/22/1990BRIEF RECEIVEDAmicus Curiae
02/16/1990BRIEF RECEIVEDAmicus Curiae
12/19/1989BRIEF FILEDState
10/26/1989BRIEF FILEDAppellant
08/14/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/08/1991MANDATE ISSD
01/23/1991REHEAR DISPDENIED
01/14/1991MOTIONDENIED
01/14/1991MOTION FILED
01/14/1991REHEAR FILED
01/14/1991REHEAR RECEIVED
01/10/1991REHEAR EXT MOTIONDENIED
01/10/1991REHEAR EXT MOTIONFiled
12/18/1990REHEAR EXT MOTIONGranted
12/18/1990REHEAR EXT MOTIONFiled
12/05/1990OPINION ISSDAffirmed COA
03/07/1990SUBMITTED
02/22/1990BRIEF RECEIVED
02/16/1990BRIEF RECEIVED
01/15/1990MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENTGranted
01/15/1990MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENTFiled
12/19/1989BRIEF FILED
12/19/1989SET FOR SUBMIS
11/27/1989EXT BRIEF DISP/NFEGranted
11/27/1989EXT BRIEF FILED
10/26/1989BRIEF FILED
10/18/1989EXT BRIEF DISPGranted
10/18/1989EXT BRIEF FILED
09/20/1989PDR DISPGranted
08/14/1989RESPONSE FILED
07/17/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/08/1991STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
CARREON, ALEJANDRO DE JESUSPAmicus CuriaeD''Ann Johnson
G. P. Monks
RANDY ADLER
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
John Holmes
CARREON, ALEJANDRO DE JESUSPApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)RANDY ADLER
D''Ann Johnson
G. P. Monks
Court of Appeals Information:
05-88-01369-CV
Aff 5-2-89
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
203rd District Court
Dallas
Honorable R. T. Scales
F87-74641-VP