judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01004-CV
05-89-01004-CV
08/11/1989
Divorce
Tischler, Joe Ray
Shelly Tischler
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
12/15/1997Record RetentionDestroy
07/17/1990Mandate Issued
07/17/1990Mandate Issued
05/23/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/23/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/02/1990Submitted
05/02/1990Submission
05/02/1990Submitted
03/15/1990MattConv
12/21/1989Brief Filed
12/21/1989Case ready to be set
12/21/1989Case ready to be set
12/04/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/30/1989Response to Motion
11/21/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/20/1989Brief Filed
10/02/1989Letter Sent by the Court
10/02/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/02/1989Supplemental Transcript filed
09/28/1989Response to Motion
09/19/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/05/1989Letter Sent by the Court
08/25/1989MattConv
08/25/1989Supplemental Transcript filed
08/21/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/21/1989Exhibits Filed
08/11/1989Transcript Filed
08/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/24/1989Appeal Bond Filed
04/28/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
336th Judicial District Court
Grayson
Honorable Ray Felty Grisham
88-0845