judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-89-00291-CR
08-89-00291-CR
08/11/1989
Other Felony
Segler, Ronald Conoway
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/21/1990Mandate Issued
12/21/1990Shuck purged
12/21/1990Mandate Issued
10/03/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/03/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/14/1990Submitted
09/14/1990Submission
09/14/1990Submitted
07/16/1990Submission
04/18/1990Brief Filed
04/18/1990Case ready to be set
04/18/1990Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/18/1990Case ready to be set
04/02/1990Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
03/23/1990Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
02/21/1990Brief Filed
02/21/1990Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/05/1990Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
01/31/1990Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
12/27/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/27/1989Statement of Facts Filed
12/12/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
11/30/1989Miscellaneous Letter of Inquiry
10/11/1989Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/26/1989Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
09/20/1989Transcript Filed
08/11/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/21/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of TexasHon. Gary Garrison
UnknownCriminal - AppellantHon. Carson Grimm
Trial Court Information
70th District Court
Ector
A-19,793
Life, TDC