judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1041-89
PD-1041-89
07/17/1989
PDR Case Type
LASALLE, LAWRENCE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/20/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/04/1989PDR DISPRefused
08/17/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
07/17/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/01/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Grant Jones
LASALLE, LAWRENCEApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Lawrence Coffey
Court of Appeals Information:
13-88-00448-CR
Aff 5-11-89
13th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
28th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Walter Dunham, Jr.
88-CR-963-A