judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00305-CV
13-89-00305-CV
08/11/1989
Unknown Civil Case Type.
The Aetna Casualty & Surety Company
Weaver, Armando
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/04/2018Case stored
04/17/1991Cite for opinions
03/18/1991Mandate Issued
01/31/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/22/1990Submitted
03/22/1990Submission
03/06/1990Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT
02/26/1990Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
02/22/1990Submission
12/01/1989Brief Filed
12/01/1989Oral argument requested
11/09/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/20/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/17/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/25/1989Brief Filed
09/25/1989Case ready to be set
09/25/1989Oral argument requested
09/14/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/14/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
09/14/1989Exhibits Filed
08/31/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/16/1989Due date for record to be filed
08/15/1989Filing Fee Paid
08/14/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
08/14/1989Filing Fee Paid
08/11/1989Transcript Received
08/11/1989Transcript Filed
08/11/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/18/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
AetnaAppellantHon. Frank E. Weathered
WeaverAppelleeHon. Randall P. Crane
Trial Court Information
Honorable Margarito Garza