judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8868
C-8868
07/17/1989
App Writ of Error
RITA R. PARISH AND BELINDA F. CROSS
MARRIETTA COGGINS AND PATRICIA D. BOWEN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
07/17/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
07/17/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/09/1989Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
10/18/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
07/26/1989Case forwarded to Court
07/26/1989No description available.
07/17/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/17/1989Reply to Response
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
11/09/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
13-88-00244-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
Rule 90, 04-20-89
13th Court of Appeals
Honorable Norman L. Utter
Trial Court Information
36th District Court
Aransas
Honorable Ronald M. Yeager
8517-A